VA HB1674 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abuse and neglect of incapacitated adults; informed consent. Clarifies, for the purposes of the exemptions to abuse and neglect of incapacitated adults, that the informed consent or a declaration of the incapacitated person must have been given when such person was not incapacitated and that any wishes of the incapacitated person relied upon must have been made known when such person was not incapacitated. The bill provides that its provisions are declaratory of existing law.
Title
Abuse and neglect of incapacitated adults; informed consent.
Sponsors
Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1674ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100716D-E |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1674E |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100716D |