VA HB1675 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Graduation requirements; local alternative paths to standard units of credit. Requires the Board of Education, in establishing course and credit requirements for a high school diploma, to permit local school divisions to waive the requirement for students to receive 140 clock hours of instruction to earn a standard unit of credit upon providing the Board with satisfactory proof, based on Board guidelines, that the students for whom such requirements are waived have learned the content and skills included in the relevant Standards of Learning.
Title
Graduation requirements; local alternative paths to standard or verified units of credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1675ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105612D-H3 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Garrett, Carrico, Lewis |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Greason, LeMunyon, Bulova |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105302D-S1 (1-Y 98-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1675S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105302D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105302D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed House (95-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1675H2 |
2015-02-05 | House | Substitute by Delegate Greason agreed to 15104849D-H2 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15104356D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104849D-H2 (Greason) |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104356D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102642D |
Same As/Similar To
SB982 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)