VA HB1686 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stocking and sale of fish; permit. Directs the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to add largemouth bass and other members of the sunfish family to the types of fish that may be raised and sold from privately owned facilities. No license to fish from such facility is required if the owner of the facility allows public fishing and has paid the permit fee.
Title
Fish; DGIF shall establish a special permit.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1686ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105301D-S1 (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1686S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105301D-S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105301D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1686H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104216D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104216D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2015-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102304D |