VA HB1695 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wildlife Corridor Action Plan; road construction projects. Directs the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries, in collaboration with the Department of Transportation and the Department of Conservation and Recreation, to create a Wildlife Corridor Action Plan (the Plan). The Plan shall identify wildlife corridors, defined as areas connecting fragmented wildlife habitats that are separated by human activities or infrastructure, and recommend wildlife crossing projects intended to promote driver safety and wildlife connectivity. The bill requires the Plan to be submitted to the Chairs of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources by September 1, 2022, and every four years thereafter. The bill also provides that the Department of Transportation shall (i) include the impact on any wildlife corridor identified in the Plan in any environmental impact report for a highway construction project and (ii) consider measures for the mitigation of harm caused to wildlife by a highway in the design options for the construction of such highway.
Title
Wildlife Corridor Action Plan; created.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 13-N) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1695ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105224D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1004 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1188.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 578 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 579 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |