VA HB1702 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation; speed limits; Planning District 8. Requires the Virginia Department of Transportation to assess the speed limit of any road in Planning District 8 that has a speed limit of 55 miles per hour and has an intersection within 1,000 feet of any public elementary or secondary school and within 2,000 feet of a road curvature.
Title
Speed limits; Dept. of Transportation to assess on certain roads.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105455D |