VA HB1733 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School boards; local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding. Requires (i) the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to develop a model memorandum of understanding and (ii) the school board in each school division in which the local law-enforcement agency employs school resource officers to enter into a memorandum of understanding with such local law-enforcement agency that is based on such model and sets forth the powers and duties of the school resource officers. The bill requires each such school board and local law-enforcement agency to review and amend or affirm the memorandum at least once every five years or at any time upon the request of either party. This bill is identical to SB 1214.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards; local law-enforcement agencies, memorandums of understanding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 0-N) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N) (Y: 1 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 455 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1733ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (88-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference substitute printed 19107494D-H1
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateSenators: Suetterlein, Barker, Newman
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-18HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Landes, VanValkenburg
2019-02-18HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-18HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-15SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-15SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106557D-S1 (1-Y 93-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1733S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106557D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106557D-S1
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-22HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HousePrinted as engrossed 19100602D-E
2019-01-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1733E
2019-01-21HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-21HouseRead second time
2019-01-18HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseReported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-12-19HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100602D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221280.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1733
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1733+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1733E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1733S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1733H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1733ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0455+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0006+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1766+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0187+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1733+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1733+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2784+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0666HB1733+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1034HB1733+HB1733
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3289+HB1733

Bill Comments

feedback