VA HB1767 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of telemedicine; prescribing. Provides that a health care practitioner who performs or has performed an appropriate examination of the patient, either physically or by the use of instrumentation and diagnostic equipment, for the purpose of establishing a bona fide practitioner-patient relationship may prescribe Schedule II through VI controlled substances to the patient, provided that the prescribing of such controlled substance is in compliance with federal requirements for the practice of telemedicine. The bill also authorizes the Board of Pharmacy to register an entity at which a patient is treated by the use of instrumentation and diagnostic equipment for the purpose of establishing a bona fide practitioner-patient relationship and is prescribed Schedule II through VI controlled substances to possess and administer Schedule II through VI controlled substances when such prescribing is in compliance with federal requirements for the practice of telemedicine and the patient is not in the physical presence of a practitioner registered with the U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to SB 1009.
Title
Telemedicine, practice of; prescribing controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0110) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 110 (effective 2/21/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1767ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101012D-E |
2017-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1767E |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17101012D |