VA HB1767 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motion picture production tax credit. Increases the cap on the total amount of motion picture production tax credits that may be issued per fiscal year from $6.5 million to $10 million beginning with fiscal year 2024.
Title
Income tax, state; motion picture production tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2023-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104230D |