VA HB1773 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Definition of pawnbrokers. Amends the definition of "pawnbroker" to only include natural persons. Under current law, a person, defined to include corporations, partnerships, associations, cooperatives, limited liability companies, trusts, joint ventures, governments, political subdivisions, or any other legal or commercial entities and any successor, representative, agent, agency, or instrumentality thereof, may become a licensed pawnbroker. The bill provides that counties, cities, or towns may choose to extend the license of a pawnbroker who is not a natural person for a period of up to one year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pawnbrokers; amends definition to only include natural persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 238 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1773ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101622D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5414000(n/a)See Bill Text
5414001(n/a)See Bill Text
5414003(n/a)See Bill Text
5414009(n/a)See Bill Text
5414010(n/a)See Bill Text
5414200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback