VA HB1784 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Port Authority; capital projects. Restricts expenditures by the Virginia Port Authority on capital projects, except certain specified projects, to those located on real property that is owned, leased, or operated by the Virginia Port Authority.
Title
Virginia Port Authority; capital projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1784ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15100282D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1784E |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100282D |