VA HB1804 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Adds cancers of the colon, brain, or testes to the list of cancers that are presumed to be an occupational disease covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when firefighters and certain employees develop the cancer. The measure will become effective if reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly. The measure also directs the 2020 Session of the General Assembly, in considering and enacting any legislation relating to workers' compensation and the presumption of compensability for certain cancers, to consider any research, findings, and recommendations from the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission's review of the Virginia Workers' Compensation program. The provisions of this bill do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2020 Session of the General Assembly. This bill is identical to SB 1030.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases, review of program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1804ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1804H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106365D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106365D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-28HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101591D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1804
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1804+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1804H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1804ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0415+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1402V0002+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0015+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0047+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2350+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0146+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0345+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1804+HB1804
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1804+HB1804

Bill Comments

feedback