VA HB1811 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Use of handheld personal communications devices while driving. Prohibits any person from holding a handheld personal communications device while driving a motor vehicle. Current law prohibits only the reading of any email or text message and manually entering letters or text in such a device as a means of communicating. The bill expands the exemptions to include handheld personal communications devices that are being held and used (i) as an amateur radio or a citizens band radio or (ii) for official Department of Transportation or traffic incident management services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handheld personal communications devices; prohibition on holding while driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (45-Y 50-N) (Y: 45 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 27-N) (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-23HouseDelegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
2019-02-23HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2019-02-23HouseHouse requested second conference committee
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 50-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report rejected by House (45-Y 50-N)
2019-02-23HousePending question ordered
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107720D-H2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Stuart, Obenshain, Chafin
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Collins, Bell, Robert B., Bourne
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendment (36-Y 4-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 27-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (69-Y 27-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1811H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106270D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106270D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-29HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101202D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621078.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1811
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1811+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1811H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1811H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0087+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0118+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2456+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0305+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1811+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0745HB1811+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3046+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0847HB1811+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3362+HB1811
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1118HB1811+HB1811

Bill Comments

feedback