VA HB1814 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Deferral of jury service; persons who have legal custody of and are responsible for the care of a child. Provides that a court may defer or limit jury service of persons who have legal custody of and are responsible for a child or children 16 years of age or younger requiring continuous care by such person during normal court hours to the term of court next after such period of responsibility ends. Under current law, persons with such responsibility are exempt upon request, but no provision is given for the court to defer such person's jury service until after such period of responsibility ends.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferral of jury service; persons who have legal custody/responsibility for care of a child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1814ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19107089D-S1 (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1814S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107089D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107089D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-31HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-31HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100437D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801341.1(n/a)See Bill Text
801341.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1814
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1814+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1814S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1814ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0518+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0803V0036+HB1814
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0092+HB1814
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2308+HB1814
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0304+HB1814
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1814+HB1814
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0756HB1814+HB1814
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3047+HB1814

Bill Comments

feedback