VA HB1815 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Assisted living facilities; emergency electrical power source; disclosure to prospective residents. Directs the State Board of Social Services to adopt regulations that require assisted living facilities to disclose to each prospective resident, or his legal representative, in writing in a document provided to the prospective resident or his legal representative and as evidenced by the written acknowledgement of the resident or his legal representative, whether the facility has an on-site emergency electrical power source for the provision of electricity during an interruption of the normal electric power supply and, if the assisted living facility does have an on-site emergency electrical power source, (i) the items for which such on-site emergency electrical power source will supply power in the event of an interruption of the normal electric power supply and (ii) whether staff of the assisted living facility have been trained to maintain and operate such on-site emergency electrical power source to ensure the provision of electricity during an interruption of the normal electrical power supply. The bill also provides that an on-site emergency electrical power source shall include both permanent on-site emergency electrical power sources and portable on-site emergency electrical power sources, provided such portable on-site emergency electrical power source remains on the premises of the assisted living facility at all times.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted living facilities; emergency electrical power source, disclosure to prospective residents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1815ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106641D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1815S1
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106641D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106641D-S1
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HousePrinted as engrossed 19101385D-E
2019-01-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1815E
2019-01-18HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-18HouseRead second time
2019-01-17HouseRead first time
2019-01-15HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 19101385D
2018-12-31HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-12-31HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101385D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321732(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1815
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1815+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1815E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1815S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1815ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0602+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0005+HB1815
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1753+HB1815
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0073+HB1815
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1815+HB1815
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0520HB1815+HB1815
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2826+HB1815

Bill Comments

feedback