VA HB1819 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; registration of athlete agents; penalty. Creates a registration requirement for athlete agents administered by the Director of the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation, sets out the requirements for registration and conduct of athlete agents, and provides for administrative, civil, and criminal penalties. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2012.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; registration of athlete agents, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 95-N) (Y: 4 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-04-06 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 95-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House rejected Governor's recommendation (4-Y 95-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1819ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100620D |