VA HB1822 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local incentives for the design, development, or production of goods for national defense. Creates a separate classification of machinery and tools designed and used directly in manufacturing or processing materials, components, or equipment for national defense. Local governments would be authorized to tax such machinery and tools at a rate that is less than the rate generally applicable to machinery and tools. The bill also authorizes local governments to establish, by ordinance, local defense production zones including incentives and regulatory flexibility for the design, development, or production by a defense production business of materials, components, or equipment for national defense. The bill incorporates
Title
Local Defense Production Zone; created and creates a separate classification of machinery and tools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 875 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1822ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation Amendments #2 and #3 (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Passed by for the day Amendment #1 | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1822ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1822H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104793D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Incorporates HB2215 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104793D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103886D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3245.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3508.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3853 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |