VA HB1915 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; regional plan. Requires NVTA's regional transportation plan to make reducing congestion in Planning District 8 its primary objective to the greatest extent practicable. The bill requires each locality embraced by the Authority to annually report to the Authority any land use or transportation elements of its comprehensive plan that are not consistent with the regional transportation plan.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; regional plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1915ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105099D-S1 (97-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1915S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105099D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105099D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1915H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104457D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104457D-H1 |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103478D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1314 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)