VA HB1917 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reporting on health professionals; assisted living facilities. Provides that the administrator of every licensed assisted living facility shall report to the Department of Health Professions any information indicating that a health professional may have a substance abuse or mental health problem.
Title
Health professionals; assisted living facility administrator report those with mental health issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1917ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103678D-E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1917E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Amendments by Delegate Merricks agreed to | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103678D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Narcotics and Drugs
Professions and Occupations
Narcotics and Drugs
Professions and Occupations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2400.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1800.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |