VA HB1917 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; renewable thermal energy. Expands the definition of "renewable thermal energy" to include the energy output from certain solar energy systems located in the Commonwealth that heat air or water for residential, commercial, institutional, or industrial processes. Under current law, the term encompasses only the energy output from renewable-fueled combined heat and power facilities used in industrial processes. Renewable thermal energy is eligible to satisfy the goals of the renewable energy portfolio standard program. The measure also defines "solar energy system" as a system that produces heat or electricity, or both, from sunlight.
Title
Electric utilities; renewable thermal energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 494 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1917ER) |
2013-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 4-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102094D |