VA HB1952 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0577)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0577)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Boards of visitors of public institutions of higher education; public access to information and governance. Adds specific topics to be covered during the educational programs for governing boards and requires such programs to be delivered by the State Council of Higher Education annually. The bill also requires each board of visitors to adopt bylaws with certain provisions relating to the Freedom of Information Act; annually meet with the president of the institution to deliver a review of the president's performance; designate its executive committee to organize the working processes of the board and recommend best practices for board governance; and annually deliver an executive summary of its interim activities to the General Assembly and the Governor. The bill is contingent on funding in the appropriation act.
Title
Higher educational institutions; board of visitors governance, report.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0577) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 577 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1952ER) |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Landes, Rust, Tyler |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Newman, Hanger, Howell |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendment #1 from (Finance) rejected by House (1-Y 97-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendment #1 agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 13100387D-E |
2013-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1952E |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-21 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100387D |