VA HB1953 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appeals from founded complaints of child abuse or neglect; concurrent criminal investigations. Provides that whenever an appeal of a finding by a local department of social services is made and a criminal investigation is also commenced against the appellant for the same conduct involving the same victim as investigated by the local department, the appeal process shall automatically be stayed until the criminal investigation is closed or, in the case of a criminal investigation that is not completed within 180 days of the appellant's request for an appeal, for 180 days. This bill is identical to SB 1416.
Title
Child abuse or neglect; appeals from founded complaints, concurrent criminal investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012) | |
2019-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 14, 2019 | |
2019-02-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1953ER) |
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103324D |