VA HB1955 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Impersonating a law-enforcement officer or other public safety personnel. Provides that any unauthorized person who wears a uniform identical to or substantially similar to a standard uniform used by an office of sheriff to impersonate the office of sheriff is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor (currently a Class 3 misdemeanor). The bill adds new punishment for a second or subsequent such offense: a Class 6 felony. The bill also adds the same new punishment for a second or subsequent offense of impersonating a law-enforcement officer or other public safety personnel, currently a Class 1 misdemeanor for any such offense.
Title
Impersonating a law-enforcement officer or other public safety personnel; impersonating, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N) (Y: 4 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N) (Y: 4 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1955ER) |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Landes, Loupassi, Hester |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Stuart, Stanley |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (4-Y 94-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1955H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104541D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104541D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100279D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 174 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 174.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |