VA HB1955 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appellate damages. Specifies that when any judgment is affirmed, whether in whole or in part, damages shall be awarded to the appellee on the portion of the judgment affirmed. This bill is a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appellate damages; specifies that when any judgment is affirmed, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
2019-02-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 134 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1955ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 2-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103353D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801682(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1955
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1955+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1955ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0134+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0006+HB1955
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0039+HB1955
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0049+HB1955
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1858+HB1955
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0225+HB1955
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1955+HB1955
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0497HB1955+HB1955

Bill Comments

feedback