VA HB1964 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-9)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-9)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial sex trafficking; penalties. Creates new felonies for trafficking of persons for commercial sexual activity. The bill provides that any person who solicits, invites, recruits, encourages, or otherwise causes or attempts to cause a person to engage in prostitution with the intent to receive money or other valuable thing or to assist another in receiving money or other valuable thing from the earnings of the solicited person from an act of prostitution is guilty of a Class 5 felony. Felonies are increased if such behavior is done by an adult and the person solicited is a minor (Class 3 felony) and if force, intimidation, or deception is used against the person solicited (Class 4 felony). The new crime was added to the definition of violent felony for the purposes of the sentencing guidelines, predicate criminal acts for street gangs, the Virginia Racketeer Influence and Corrupt Organization Act, multijurisdiction grand jury, and asset forfeiture and, if a minor is solicited, the Sex Offender Registry. The bill also amends two existing Code sections on receiving money for procuring a person for prostitution and receiving money from the earnings of a person engaged in prostitution to increase penalties if the crime involves a minor.
Title
Commercial sex trafficking; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1964ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105591D-H2 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Howell, McDougle |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Delegates: Hugo, Bell, Robert B., Watts |
2015-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-25 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105142D-S1 (1-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1964S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105142D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105142D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1964H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104694D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104694D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103251D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1188 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)