VA HB1981 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Correctional Enterprises; procedure for exemptions to the mandatory purchase provisions. Provides that any department, institution, or agency of the Commonwealth is required to obtain the written consent of only the Chief Executive Officer of the Virginia Correctional Enterprises Program (the Program) to be granted an exemption from the Program's mandatory purchase provisions. Under current law, such department, institution, or agency is required to obtain the consent of both the Chief Executive Officer of the Program and the Director of the Division of Purchases and Supply. The bill provides that in any case where an exemption from the mandatory purchase provisions is not granted, the Chief Executive Officer of the Program shall provide a written justification for the denial to the department, institution, or agency that requested the exemption. Under current law, a written explanation is required any time an exemption is granted.
Title
Virginia Correctional Enterprises; procedure for exemptions to the mandatory purchase provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 167 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1981ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101874D |