VA HB201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Center for Rural Virginia Board of Trustees; membership. Adds the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry as a member of the Board of Trustees for the Center for Rural Virginia.
Title
Rural Virginia, Center for; adds Secretary of Agriculture & Forestry as member of Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0392) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 392 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB201ER) |
2014-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-21 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2013-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102140D |
Same As/Similar To
SB83 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)