VA HB2014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family First Prevention Services Act; statutory alignment. Aligns the Code of Virginia with the federal Family First Prevention Services Act of 2018. The bill contains an emergency clause for provisions of the bill relating to background checks for employees of, volunteers at, and contractors providing services to juveniles at children's residential facilities.
Title
Family First Prevention Services Act, federal; statutory alignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 3/8/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2014ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (93-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101811D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 281 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 282.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 408.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 906.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |