VA HB2020 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unmanned aircraft systems; trespass over correctional facilities; penalty. Prohibits any unmanned aircraft system from (i) dropping any item within the boundaries of or (ii) obtaining any videographic or still image of any identifiable inmate or resident at any state or local correctional facility or juvenile correctional center without consent or authorization. A violation of this prohibition is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems; trespass over correctional facilities, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024) | |
2023-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2020ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2020H1 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104762D-H1 |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104762D-H1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101317D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1073 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
SB1073 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
SB1073 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)