VA HB2025 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Hampton; candidacy of councilmembers in mayoral election. Bars any City of Hampton mayoral candidate from simultaneously running for a place on the Hampton city council and establishes a procedure for the resignation of any serving councilmember not elected on the same election cycle as the mayor who wishes to run for mayor. The bill establishes a deadline, effective date, and other parameters for the resignation of a serving councilmember and provides for the filling of the remaining term of office of a councilmember who has resigned to become a candidate in a mayoral election.
Title
Hampton, City of; amending charter, candidacy of councilmembers in mayoral election.
Sponsors
Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 438 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2025ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103543D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2025E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103543D |
Same As/Similar To
SB695 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)