VA HB2039 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Procurement by public bodies; use of certain contracting processes. Limits the use of the construction management at-risk method for building construction to projects with a total value of $25 million or more. The bill also amends the definition of "qualifying project" in the Public-Private Education Facilities and Infrastructure Act of 2002 (§56-575.1 et seq.) to require that the project be totally supported by private funds.
Title
Construction management; limits use of at-risk method for building construction projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103524D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2039 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2039+hil |