VA HB2039 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pilot program; eliminate distinction between credit and noncredit hours at certain public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth. Requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to establish and administer a four-year pilot program whereby public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth that meet certain criteria may eliminate the distinction between credit hours and noncredit hours for students enrolled at the institution.
Title
Higher educational institutions; establishment of pilot program.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102287D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2039 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2039+hil |