VA HB2052 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Right to vote by secret ballot on labor organization representation. Declares that in any procedure providing for the designation, selection, or authorization of a labor organization to represent employees, the right of an individual employee to vote by secret ballot is a fundamental right that shall be guaranteed from infringement.
Title
Labor organization representation; right to vote by secret ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (9-Y 6-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 32-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House (63-Y 32-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-26 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-25 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-20 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102651D |