VA HB2075 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
IEIA; Commonwealth Innovation and Entrepreneurship Measurement System. Authorizes the Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority to create the Commonwealth Innovation and Entrepreneurship Measurement System as a tool to measure areas within the Commonwealth worthy of economic development and institutional focus in furtherance of the Commonwealth Research and Development Strategic Roadmap.
Title
Commonwealth Innovation and Entrepreneurship Measurement System; authorizes IEIA to create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104465D-H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103489D |