VA HB2076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Petersburg. Provides that the city manager for the City of Petersburg shall serve as the collector of city taxes and transfers certain duties from the city treasurer to the city manager.
Title
Petersburg, City of; amending charter, city manager shall serve as collector of city taxes, duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103093D |