VA HB2111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Immunity from civil liability; abuse of process, malicious prosecution, or intentional infliction of emotional distress; statements made in the course of judicial proceedings or communications made relating to criminal conduct. Adds statements made in the course of judicial proceedings and communications made to any government officer relating to potential criminal conduct to the list of persons' statements that are immune from certain actions or civil liability. The list further adds abuse of process, malicious prosecution, and intentional infliction of emotional distress to the list of actions from which such person is immune.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunity from civil liability; abuse of process, malicious prosecution, or emotional distress.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101848D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801223.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback