VA HB2147 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Substance abuse screening and assessment of public assistance applicants and recipients. Requires local departments of social services to screen each VIEW program participant to determine whether probable cause exists to believe the participant is engaged in the use of illegal drugs. The bill provides that when a screening indicates reasonable cause to believe a participant is using illegal drugs, the Department of Social Services shall require drug testing. Any person who fails or refuses to participate in a screening or assessment without good cause or who tests positive for the use of illegal drugs shall be ineligible to receive TANF payments for a period of one year.
Title
VIEW Program; screening and assessment for use of illegal substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102814D |