VA HB2150 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Court fees; fixed misdemeanor and fixed felony fees. Amends the fees collected by courts for felony and misdemeanor convictions to reflect 2010 amendments to §15.2-1627.3 by Chapter 874 increasing fees of attorneys for the Commonwealth.
Title
Court fees; fixed misdemeanor and fixed felony fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 565 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2150ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2150H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104703D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104703D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103100D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 275.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |