VA HB2150 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth's tax code; conformity with federal law; emergency. Advances the conformity with the federal tax code from December 31, 2011, to January 2, 2013, and restores conformity with the federal earned income tax credit. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Tax code, state; advances conformity with Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2013-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 2/15/13) | |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2150ER) |
2013-02-07 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (82-Y 16-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance (15-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #1 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13103454D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1241 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0693)