VA HB2178 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hybrid retirement program; school division deferred compensation and cash match plans. Allows school divisions the option of establishing and administering their own deferred compensation and cash match plans for the hybrid retirement program. Employees of such school divisions would have the option of participating in such programs. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2016.
Title
Hybrid retirement program; disclosure of services, etc., associated with voluntary contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective - see bill) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2178ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105121D-S1 (96-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2178S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105121D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105121D-S1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2178H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104355D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104355D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103653D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1162 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)