VA SB1162 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hybrid retirement program; school division deferred compensation and cash match plans. Allows school divisions the option of establishing and administering their own deferred compensation and cash match plans for the hybrid retirement program. Employees of such school divisions would have the option of participating in such programs. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2016.
Title
Hybrid retirement program; disclosure of services, etc., associated with voluntary contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective - see bill) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1162ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Title replaced 15105033D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1162H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105033D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105033D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1162S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104576D-S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104576D-S1 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103535D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)