VA HB220 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Polling places; campaigning activities. Clarifies that the exemption allowing a voter to enter a polling place wearing a shirt, hat, or other apparel on which a candidate's name or a political slogan appears does not apply to candidates, representatives of candidates, or any other person who enters the polling place for a purpose other than voting. Local electoral boards are provided the flexibility in the designation of the 40-foot prohibited area if an entrance to the building is from an adjoining building, or if establishing the prohibited area outside the polling place would hinder or delay a qualified voter from entering or leaving the building.
Title
Polling places; clarifies exemption allowing a voter to enter wearing apparel with candidate's name.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. James Scott [D] |
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 707 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB220ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101334D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |