VA HB220 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driving while intoxicated; refusal of blood or breath tests. Requires that a person who has been arrested for driving while intoxicated and who has refused to submit to a blood or breath test must be given another opportunity to consent to testing after the arresting officer has advised the person of the consequences of his refusal using the form provided by the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court.
Title
Driving while intoxicated; refusal of blood or breath tests.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101601D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB220 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB220+hil |