VA HB220 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public access to resumes and other information related to gubernatorial appointees. Provides that the personnel, working papers, and correspondence record exemption shall not be construed to authorize the withholding of any resumes or applications submitted by persons who are appointed by the Governor. The bill further provides that the resumes and applications for appointment submitted by persons who are appointed by the Governor shall be available to the public upon request. The bill provides that its provisions apply to persons appointed by the Governor on or after July 1, 2016. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia FOIA; public access to resumes and other information related to gubernatorial appointee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729) | |
2016-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB220ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 20-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (78-Y 20-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 16102347D-E |
2016-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB220E |
2016-01-29 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102347D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |