VA HB2225 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Corrections; inmate trust accounts. Requires the Department of Corrections to establish for each inmate a personal trust account consisting of 10 percent of any funds received by an inmate from any source until the account has a balance of $1,000. Funds in an inmate's personal trust account shall be paid to the inmate upon parole or final discharge.
Title
Inmates; Department of Corrections to establish a personal trust account therefor.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 260 (effective 1/1/12) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2225ER) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2225H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104399D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104399D-H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101552D |