VA HB2230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stock corporations; shareholders' meetings. Authorizes the board of directors of a stock corporation to determine that any meeting of shareholders not be held at any place and instead be held by means of remote communication, if the articles of incorporation or bylaws do not require the meeting to be held at a place. The measure also limits the provision that currently authorizes the holders of at least 20 percent of the votes entitled to be cast on an issue to call a special meeting of shareholders of a corporation that has 35 or fewer shareholders by requiring that the corporation not be a public corporation.
Title
Stock corporations; shareholders' meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2230ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102045D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 654 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 655 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 658 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 660.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 661 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |