VA HB2309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; grant of interest in subaqueous lands; federal civil works project; report. Authorizes the Commonwealth, acting through the Marine Resources Commission, to grant to a political subdivision of the Commonwealth an easement over, or title to, certain beds of the waters of the Commonwealth. The bill requires that the political subdivision receiving such a grant be acting in the capacity of an official nonfederal sponsor, with the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, of a federally authorized civil works project and that the grant be necessary to the carrying out of such project.
Title
Marine Resources Commission; grant of interest in subaqueous lands, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103978D |