VA HB2324 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Payment of jurors; prepaid debit card or card account. Adds payment by credit to a prepaid debit card or card account to the methods by which a juror may be paid. The bill requires that, where such method is used, such card or card account permit the juror to withdraw or transfer funds without incurring a fee.
Title
Jurors; payment by prepaid debit card or card account.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 799 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2324ER2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2324ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103767D |