VA HB2331 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Election laws; enforcement and prosecution. Gives the Attorney General the independent authority to enforce and prosecute violations of election laws in addition to the existing authority granted to the Attorney General pursuant to a unanimous vote of all members of the Board of Elections requesting the Attorney General to assist an attorney for the Commonwealth.
Title
Election laws; Attorney General shall have full authority to enforce laws or prosecute violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator McEachin rejected (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 17-N) (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator McEachin rejected (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 17-N) (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 768 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2331ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 8-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 9-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2331ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McEachin rejected (20-Y 20-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 17-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 17-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13104246D |