VA HB2385 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; barge and rail usage tax credit. Grants an income tax credit for the usage of barge and rail to move cargo containers throughout the Commonwealth rather than trucks or other motor vehicles on the Commonwealth's highways. The amount of the credit is $25 per 20-foot equivalent unit (TEU) moved by barge or rail. The credit will be available for taxable years beginning on January 1, 2011, but before January 1, 2015. The Tax Commissioner would be allowed to issue up to $1.5 million in tax credits in a fiscal year.
Title
Income tax, state; barge and rail usage tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 12-N) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 12-N) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2385ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 6-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2385ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 12-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105327D-S1 (78-Y 12-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2385S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105327D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105327D-S1 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2385H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104851D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104851D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2011-01-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-14 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104096D |