VA HB241 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prescribed Pediatric Extended Care Centers; licensure; regulation. Authorizes the Board of Health to license prescribed pediatric extended care centers. The bill establishes the scope of services offered by such centers and requirements for operation, management, staffing, facilities, and maintenance and directs the Board to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Prescribed pediatric extended care centers; licensure, regulation.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Karen Keys-Gamarra [D] |
Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106172D-H1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101390D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 162.15:1.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.15:1.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |